YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN FIRST

Charity number: 1157870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 16/09/2016 30/09/2017 29/09/2018 29/09/2019 29/09/2020
Total gross income £90.11k £121.66k £174.64k £181.57k £212.39k
Total expenditure £64.64k £87.84k £140.67k £152.24k £206.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A