YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN FIRST

Charity number: 1157870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Salmon Trustee 16 December 2019 None on record
Peter Andrew Harris Trustee 04 March 2019 None on record
Timothy Dyson Chair 21 January 2019 None on record
Anna Julia Savage Trustee 30 June 2019 None on record
Paul Greenan Trustee 02 July 2018 None on record
Michele Parrett Trustee 03 September 2021 None on record
Karen Ferris Trustee 03 August 2020 None on record
Steven Thomas Perkins Trustee 03 August 2020 None on record
MARGARET BHATT Trustee 26 January 2015 None on record