Trustees THE SAIGON CHILDREN'S CHARITY CIO

Charity number: 1157774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID HUW APPLETON Chair 15 July 2016
None on record
Jason Michael Turnbull Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
James Samuel Charles Estaugh Trustee 02 June 2022
None on record
Alexander Christopher Falter Trustee 02 June 2022
None on record
Richard Burrage Trustee 15 March 2020
None on record
Chung Seck Trustee 15 March 2020
None on record
DIANA SIMONE WELLS Trustee 16 March 2014
THE GALPIN SOCIETY
Overdue by 23 days
JONATHON RALPH ALEXANDER WAUGH Trustee 16 March 2014
None on record