ROTHERHAM FEDERATION OF COMMUNITIES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RotherFed supports communities in Rotherham Borough to grow and develop, working with them to build their sense of belonging, community pride and spirit. We work with and through grass roots community groups that are committed to bringing communities together, giving all communities a voice and creating local solutions to local issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income:
£803,511
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £802.51k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £828 | |
Other | £178 |
Total expenditure:
£816,167
Raising funds | £3.87k | |
Charitable activities | £812.29k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £337,607 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £3.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £812.29k |
People

17 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
340 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Rotherham
Governance
- 17 September 2014: Standard registration
- ROTHERFED (Working name)
- ROTHERHAM FEDERATION OF TENANTS AND RESIDENTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barry Dealey | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Stringer | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Workman | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Birch | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Ramsden | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stella Ann Parkin | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kay Bacon | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARY JACQUES | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £453.13k | £491.01k | £798.98k | £831.37k | £803.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £428.55k | £399.59k | £663.78k | £791.45k | £816.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £160.00k | £160.00k | £160.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £219.02k | £62.31k | £337.61k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £798.84k | £828.57k | £802.51k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £140 | £107 | £828 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £2.70k | £178 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £658.29k | £784.46k | £812.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £5.49k | £6.99k | £3.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £480 | £1.96k | £1.82k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £118.05k | £107.73k | £103.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £535.37k | £562.04k | £573.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £18.23k | £4.97k | £28.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/08/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14/11/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JUL 2019 as amended on 24 Mar 2020 as amended on 24 Mar 2020 as amended on 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE (A) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF ROTHERHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (B) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Springwell Community Centre
Eastwood View
Rotherham
S65 1NH
- Phone:
- 01709368515
- Email:
- info@rotherfed.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window