COMPASSION PRISON MINISTRY

Charity number: 1161943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 06 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 March 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 October 2016 On time Download