Accounts and annual returns FAM PAPA BOUBA DIOP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156679
Charity reporting is overdue by 1486 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 25 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 390 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 755 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 755 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1120 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1120 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1486 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1486 days