Financial history HEATH CHRISTIAN BOOKSHOP TRUST

Charity number: 504644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £75.09k £71.15k £68.22k £64.40k £55.95k
Total expenditure £66.91k £68.51k £67.85k £63.57k £50.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £20.62k