LOVE SIERRA LEONE

Charity number: 1157847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £28.03k £32.54k £26.25k £28.41k £38.25k
Total expenditure £30.16k £32.61k £24.04k £32.03k £36.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A