Accounts and annual returns CAMINO WAY LIMITED

Charity number: 1158163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 March 2021 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required