Financial history THE LONDON ORATORY SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158059
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £63.61k £73.75k £41.22k £14.34k £1.54k
Total expenditure £13.11k £53.18k £22.82k £2.76k £27.74k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A