BRAITHWELL AND MICKLEBRING RECREATION AND LEISURE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BROWNIES & GUIDES; PARTIES; CHRISTENING; WEDDING RECEPTION; WAKE; WHEELBARROW RACE; FITNESS; MARTIAL ARTS; FOOTBALL; OUTDOOR BOWLS; MEETINGS; GENERALLY A RESOURCE FOR THE VILLAGES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 May 1996: Standard registration
- BMRLA (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Beard | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Patricia Horsfield | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Peter Munro | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Thomas Clement Lockhart | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Anthony Goodman | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.63k | £17.41k | £46.30k | £58.33k | £68.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.00k | £37.52k | £50.77k | £57.00k | £68.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £11.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £65.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 January 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 January 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BRAITHWELL AND MICKLEBRING AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Linked charities
- 07 May 1996 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ruddle Centre
Doncaster Road
Braithwell
S66 7BA
- Phone:
- 07454313256
- Email:
- treasurer@bmrla.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window