CHAGFORD JUBILEE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1158870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 25 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 02 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 07 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 February 2017 On time Download