CHAGFORD JUBILEE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1158870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isabeau Alexandra Walker Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
NICHOLAS WILLIAM JOLLIFFE Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
CHRIS WEBBER Trustee 14 October 2014 None on record
GRAHAM PETER MEAD Trustee 14 October 2014 None on record
RICHARD DAVID SMITH Trustee 06 December 2018 None on record
SARAH ELIZABETH O'CONNELL Trustee 12 August 2020 None on record
DR Jill Millar Trustee 02 March 2016 None on record
SUSAN GAY HILL Trustee 14 October 2014
SIR GEORGE COLVILE HAYTER-HAMES Received: On time
CHAGFORD COMBINED CHARITY Received: On time
Dr COLIN BARNES MB, FRCP Trustee 14 October 2014 None on record
ANDREW MARTIN FINCH Trustee 12 August 2020 None on record