WEST MALLING COMMUNITY CHOIR

Charity number: 1157075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Community choir promoting the enjoyment of singing within the choir and beyond to audiences at our concerts

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,840
Total expenditure: £15,809

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WMCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Paul Morse Chair 01 June 2020
None on record
Tricia Durrant Trustee 06 March 2022
None on record
Jacqueline Diane Baker Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
LINDA COOPER Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.88k £6.75k £8.73k £29.65k £19.84k
Total expenditure £11.00k £7.50k £9.10k £28.84k £15.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 August 2024 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 August 2024 285 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Tassell Close
East Malling
West Malling
ME19 6QB
Phone:
01732848986