COMMONWEALTH COUNTRIES LEAGUE

Charity number: 1159625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CECILIA MUCHEMI Trustee 25 July 2019
OPPORTUNITY AND GRACE FOUNDATION Overdue by 141 days
ZAKIA AHSAN Trustee 15 March 2016 None on record
DAVID NORTH Trustee 15 December 2014 None on record
MRS PARANAVITANE Trustee 15 December 2014 None on record
MARJORIE JANNET RENNIE Trustee 28 November 2014 None on record
Matthew Akintoye Odu Trustee 16 June 2017 None on record
ANTHONY CARY Trustee 15 December 2014 None on record
LOUISA ANNE SERVICE Trustee 15 December 2014 None on record
Irene Kuan Trustee 25 July 2019 None on record
SIR PETER HEAP Trustee 15 December 2014
ANGLO-BRAZILIAN SOCIETY Received: On time
NEENA DUGAL Trustee 15 December 2014 None on record