BRISTOL EARLY YEARS TEACHING CONSORTIUM

Charity number: 1156798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £414.16k £171.58k £268.25k £266.58k £243.71k
Total expenditure £475.81k £249.55k £127.24k £272.91k £208.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £142.22k N/A £175.00k N/A
Income from government grants £414.16k £0 £208.25k £35.96k £243.71k