BRISTOL EARLY YEARS TEACHING CONSORTIUM

Charity number: 1156798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Isobel Clark Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
PRUDENCE SHIRLEY WILLMOTT Trustee 06 October 2015 None on record
Nicola Theobald Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
Ali Carrington Trustee 16 May 2019 None on record
MS LUCY ELIZABETH DRIVER Trustee 31 March 2014 None on record
Daniella Glazzard Chair 01 August 2017 None on record
Jeanette Hill Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record