EDIBLE YORK

Charity number: 1158779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.07k £10.70k £12.19k £8.48k £2.78k
Total expenditure £5.06k £7.97k £3.52k £19.05k £3.36k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.54k £4.10k N/A N/A