CHARMOUTH PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1157166
Charity reporting is overdue by 453 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 453 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 453 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required