GLOBAL FUND FOR WOMEN UK

Charity number: 1160840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required