Financial history MURTON PARISH INSTITUTE CIO

Charity number: 1156914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £4.78k £4.16k £9.82k £12.57k £9.09k
Total expenditure £3.15k £3.66k £10.22k £4.41k £3.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.33k £8.34k