APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES (NORTHAMPTON)GETHSEMANE ASSEMBLY

Charity number: 1157667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AS CONTAINED IN OUR CONFESSION OF FAITH SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £77,715
Total expenditure: £42,805

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REASON FUNGAI KATURUZA Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
TAPIWA MUJURU Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £56.80k £50.05k £50.53k £51.48k £77.72k
Total expenditure £54.48k £27.12k £49.62k £44.42k £42.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 Balmoral Close
NORTHAMPTON
NN5 4WA
Phone:
07903941610
Email:
No information available