KRAFTWORKS

Charity number: 1157498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.33k £8.01k £4.21k £3.32k £2.48k
Total expenditure £3.98k £5.28k £2.05k £1.98k £1.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A