Financial history I MADE THIS (EDUCATION THROUGH THE ARTS)

Charity number: 1157400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £83.94k £73.00k £61.31k £10.25k £20.75k
Total expenditure £70.80k £65.00k £43.55k £7.75k £44.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A