MIND IN SALFORD

Charity number: 1156625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £790.07k £792.17k £826.33k £1.08m £1.21m
Total expenditure £653.19k £656.34k £738.92k £973.96k £1.11m
Income from government contracts £642.76k £535.17k £757.06k £641.64k £657.73k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £29.83k
Income - Donations and legacies £54.89k £15.50k £5.59k £36.74k £28.03k
Income - Other trading activities £23.19k £39.07k £32.34k £44.20k £100.35k
Income - Charitable activities £642.76k £737.60k £788.31k £1.00m £1.08m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12 £0 £83 £315 £484
Income - Other £69.22k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £46.68k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £629.14k £630.37k £679.36k £880.24k £1.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.05k £25.97k £59.57k £93.72k £74.21k
Expenditure - Governance £1.62k £1.62k £1.20k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0