AL-ISTIQAAMAH

Charity number: 1158070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.45k £9.40k £13.39k £8.84k £4.53k
Total expenditure £7.59k £8.82k £10.71k £11.68k £6.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A