JARROVIANS RUGBY UNION FOOTBALL CLUB LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for playing sports and in particular, rugby union football. Providing suitably qualified coaches and first aid if required to benefit the residents of Jarrow and the surrounding areas. Working with voluntary and other organisations to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 07 August 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN BERRY | Chair | 20 October 2015 |
|
|||||
THOMAS WILSON | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.60k | £24.44k | £51.95k | £60.91k | £79.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.07k | £22.22k | £42.80k | £52.53k | £78.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £450 | N/A | N/A | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
"THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS AND, IN PARTICULAR, RUGBY UNION." "TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF JARROW AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS."
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 The Grove
Jarrow
NE32 4RY
- Phone:
- 01914224074
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.