KEHILLAT NASHIRA

Charity number: 1157989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.67k £8.41k £6.02k £11.11k £20.29k
Total expenditure £5.09k £5.76k £7.68k £9.63k £10.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A