Accounts and annual returns Ciro & Armand Charity Foundation - Help Children Now

Charity number: 1157493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 22 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required