Financial history HEART OF THE CITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1165434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £396.64k £297.75k £301.99k £347.25k £472.26k
Total expenditure £256.86k £293.22k £311.77k £330.92k £318.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £172.95k £32.92k N/A N/A £188.39k