Trustees HEART OF THE CITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1165434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GAVIN MACFARLANE BLACK Chair 09 September 2013
THE CHARLOTTE STRAKER PROJECT
Received: On time
Marion Williams Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Teresa Cairns Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Hannah MacRobert Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
GEOFFREY VINCENT MILLER Trustee 12 October 2021
THE NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
NON ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: 15 days late
THE FRIENDS OF ST NICHOLAS - NORTHUMBERLAND
Received: On time
Linda Conlon Trustee 23 August 2018
INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR LIFE TRUST
Received: On time
Eric Jubb Trustee 10 January 2018
TOGETHER NEWCASTLE
Received: On time
PETER WOOD Trustee 19 January 2016
THE CHARLOTTE STRAKER PROJECT
Received: On time
DR RICHARD MALCOLM PEARS Trustee 02 August 2015
None on record
JOHN GRUNDY Trustee 15 December 2011
FRIENDS OF BEAMISH, THE NORTH OF ENGLAND OPEN AIR MUSEUM LIMITED
Received: On time
SUSAN KATHARINE WARD Trustee 23 November 2010
None on record