BRECON FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1157203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 01 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 11 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 11 October 2016 On time Download