BRECON FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1157203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.52k £8.99k £7.02k £29.42k £65.90k
Total expenditure £3.87k £4.22k £5.94k £12.25k £23.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £3.62k