THE HOLY CHURCH OF GOD LONDON

Charity number: 1156907
Charity reporting is up to date (47 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 March 2018 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 March 2018 37 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 09 March 2018 402 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 May 2017 108 days late Download