ADINATH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1160214
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 January 2020 01 February 2021 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 January 2020 01 February 2021 77 days late Download
Annual return 16 January 2019 18 January 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 January 2019 18 January 2020 63 days late Download
Annual return 16 January 2018 01 April 2019 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 January 2018 01 April 2019 136 days late Download
Annual return 15 January 2017 23 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2017 23 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 15 January 2016 14 February 2017 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 January 2016 14 February 2017 91 days late Download