Accounts and annual returns RIGHT CHOICE ACADEMY
Charity number: 1161957

Charity reporting is overdue by 147 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 147 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 147 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 06 May 2020 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 06 May 2020 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 10 January 2020 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 10 January 2020 | 255 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window