FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL MUSEUM OF BERMUDA (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes and supports the National Museum of Bermuda (incorporating the Bermuda Maritime Museum), in particular, the permanent preservation of such maritime artefacts and relics of historical archaeological and technical interest and maintain in perpetuity the museum and the historical buildings and gun emplacements within the historic fortifications of the old Royal Naval Dockyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bermuda
Governance
- 15 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Duncan Raukawa FERGUSSON | Chair | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Baroness Elizabeth Kay Andrews OBE | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN COAD | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Colin Fleming | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|||||
GREGORY LUNN | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £945 | £5.90k | £54.89k | £11.55k | £7.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £260 | £269 | £60.37k | £4.52k | £260 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 May 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE AND FOSTER RESEARCH (AND TO PUBLISH SUCH RESEARCH) ON ANY TERRITORIAL AND MARITIME HISTORICAL SUBJECTS WHETHER OR NOT RELATING TO THE MUSEUM OR THE ISLANDS OF BERMUDA AND TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF SUCH MARITIME ARTEFACTS AND RELICS OF HISTORICAL ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND TECHNICAL INTEREST AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE WHERESOEVER THE SAME SHALL BE SITUATED AND TO PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN IN PERPETUITY THE MUSEUM AND THE HISTORICAL BUILDINGS AND GUN EMPLACEMENTS WITHIN THE AREA OF THE HISTORIC FORTIFICATIONS OF THE OLD ROYAL NAVAL DOCKYARD SITUATE AT THE NORTHERN END OF THE IRELAND ISLAND WITHIN THE PARISH OF SANDYS IN BERMUDA AS A MARITIME MUSEUM FOR THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF ALL MARITIME SUBJECTS FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF AND WITH THE OBJECT OF ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 ST. PAULS MEWS
LONDON
NW1 9TZ
- Phone:
- 07768620258
- Email:
- colinamfleming@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window