JRC SIMPSON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1157972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/05/2017 01/05/2018 01/05/2019 01/05/2020 01/05/2021
Total gross income £1.45k £29.52k £7.66k £10.71k £28.97k
Total expenditure £24.13k £14.51k £6.66k £6.36k £21.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A