MRKH CONNECT

Charity number: 1157477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 10 December 2017 On time Download