ACTION DEAFNESS

Charity number: 1163758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BEN STEPHENS Trustee 19 March 2013 None on record
PENELOPE ANNE LENON Trustee 17 September 2019
HEADINGTON SCHOOL OXFORD LIMITED Received: On time
OXFORD CIVIC SOCIETY Received: On time
Lucy Warnes Trustee 11 December 2018 None on record
ALISON LEWIS Trustee 15 March 2015
LINCOLNSHIRE DEAF SERVICES Overdue by 545 days
William Harold Stavert Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
EMMA ALLEN Trustee 14 March 2017 None on record
Ross Grant Trustee 08 December 2020 None on record
Audrey Whyte Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Andrew Freeman Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
ROLAND HILTON Trustee 09 September 2011 None on record
Barry Keith ROSS Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
HELEN FOULKES Trustee 13 June 2017 None on record