STAINES SHOPMOBILITY.

Charity Number: 1157628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Staines Shopmobility provides mobility equipment such as wheelchairs to enable people with limited mobility to fully access shops and facilities in Staines town centre. The charity also hires travel scooters and wheelchairs to enable people to visit family or go on holiday. An information service is available to provide information on services and products relevant to older or disabled people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £42,572
Total expenditure: £46,114

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 June 2014: CIO registration
  • 30 April 2015: Funds received from 1072988 STAINES SHOPMOBILITY
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTINE ANNE BANNISTER Chair 25 February 2018
STAINES PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
GARY LITTLE Trustee 28 September 2013
None on record
MARIAN ROUGH Trustee 28 September 2011
None on record
SIMON BHADYE Trustee 29 September 2009
None on record
TERENCE COLLIER Trustee 27 September 2009
None on record
KEITH GOLDSON Trustee 12 July 2001
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £57.71k £64.76k £56.97k £40.58k £42.57k
Total expenditure £54.78k £54.05k £48.39k £43.04k £46.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k £15.00k £25.00k £15.00k £15.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Staines Shopmobility
Two Rivers Retail Park
Mustard Mill Road
Staines-upon-Thames
TW18 4BL
Phone:
01784 459416