TREVETHIN AND PENYGARN NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2021 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 October 2021 621 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 October 2021 986 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 April 2021 1163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 08 April 2021 1528 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required