TREVETHIN AND PENYGARN NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.34k £3.34k £3.34k £3.42k £3.67k
Total expenditure £4.58k £4.58k £4.58k £2.82k £3.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A