Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY CHURCH, PUTNEY

Charity number: 1158141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window