Accounts and annual returns ACTS FAST

Charity number: 1157675
Charity reporting is overdue by 49 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 49 days
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2022 Overdue Overdue by 49 days
Annual return 02 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2021 02 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window