Financial history ACTS FAST

Charity number: 1157675
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 02/04/2019 02/04/2020 02/04/2021 02/04/2022
Total gross income £32.91k £67.08k £32.59k £94.39k £107.86k
Total expenditure £30.62k £54.51k £42.12k £92.27k £105.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £25.32k N/A N/A £3.25k