Trustees ACTS FAST
Charity number: 1157675

Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simone Elizabeth Walls-MacDonald | Chair | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Armitage | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Ching-Yu Huang | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Terri Cole | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
NOEL DAVID SPREADBURY MBE | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.