OLDEN COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity number: 1158105
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 85 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 85 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 February 2020 239 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 February 2020 239 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 February 2020 600 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 February 2020 600 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 July 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 July 2017 27 days late Download