OLDEN COMMUNITY GARDEN

Charity number: 1158105
Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £28.39k £19.84k £19.84k £17.61k £13.58k
Total expenditure £24.43k £21.39k £21.39k £15.22k £15.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.30k £0 £0 N/A N/A