Accounts and annual returns PENDLE DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 04 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 June 2021 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 21 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required